+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1
- SA's read, adopted
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from General Government committee
- Referred to Rules
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Hall
- Remove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Taylor
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
- General Order
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency added
- Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Boles
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 8, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor