+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/04/2015
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
- SA's read, adopted
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 11
- General Order
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Faught
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2015: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 11
March 3, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor