+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 13
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 37; Ayes: 40 Nays: 44
- Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 53 Nays: 19
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McDaniel (Randy)
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 42
- General Order
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 16, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 4
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 12
March 13, 2013: House Reconsider Measure
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 29
March 13, 2013: House Emergency
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 17
March 11, 2013: House Advance From General Order
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 19
March 11, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 42
- Absent: 11
February 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
February 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor