+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 29, 2022 in the House:
- Becomes law without Governor's signature 10/06/2022
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On September 29, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6
- CCR adopted
- CCR read
On September 29, 2022 in the House:
- To Senate
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 8
- CCR adopted
- Sent to Governor
On September 28, 2022 in the House:
- Remove Senator Treat as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Thompson
- Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Wallace
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert
- Enacting clause restored
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall
- CCR submitted
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Frix, Dollens
- Title restored
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 4
- General Order, Amended
- Enacting clause stricken
- Conference granted, SCs named Treat, McCortney, Thompson, Hall, Floyd
- Referred for engrossment
- Engrossed to House
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Special Session Conference Committee
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 2
- Title stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
September 29, 2022: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 6
May 27, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 4