+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/04/2015
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Faught
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 3, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor