+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 15
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Senator Hicks
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Grego
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Brewer
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Fugate, Bell, Roe
- General Order
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Worthen
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
February 24, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor