+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Roe
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 12, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 25, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 4