+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion expired
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Considered
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Kannady, Randleman, Davis
- Authored by Senator Hicks (principal Senate author)
- Amended
- Placed on Third Reading
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Rosecrants
- Laid over
- Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Randleman
- Third Reading rescinded
- House Rule suspended
- Motion to table amendment failed
- Ayes: 25 Nays: 56
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 56
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Rosecrants
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2019: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 19
March 13, 2019: House Table Amendment
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 20
March 13, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 6
February 12, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15