+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Brecheen
- Remove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Newberry
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Ritze, Cleveland
- First Reading
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 7
- Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, McCullough
- General Order
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Brumbaugh
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 6
February 3, 2015: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2