+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7
- Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey), Dills, Pae
- General Order
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sims
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 8
February 20, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 28
February 11, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6