+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 22
- Amended
- General Order
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Faught
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 11, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor