+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Health and Aging
- Received in House
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Medicaid, Health & Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Vote
February 4, 2014: Resolution Adoption
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor