+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Committee
On November 15, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor