+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Action
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Adopted
+ − Votes (10)
September 26, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 9
September 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 30, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 2
June 30, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 28, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
April 19, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 4
March 29, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 27
March 28, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 11
March 23, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
February 21, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor