+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Action
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Adopted
+ − Votes (5)
June 7, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 17
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
April 25, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 11
March 23, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
March 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor