+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Committee Health
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Offered
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Health, Human Services and Medicaid
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Health, Human Services and Medicaid
On November 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor