+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (2)
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Energy and Public Utilities
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Offered
+ − Votes (3)
May 24, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 88
April 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 15
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (85)
Type:
Primary Sponsor