+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (2)
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Education
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (5)
June 30, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 30
June 30, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 6
June 15, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 7
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
April 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (77)
Type:
Primary Sponsor