+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective 6/13/17Emergency: effective June 13, 2017
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed - Amended
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reported
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (85)
Type:
Primary Sponsor