+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (2)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Local Government
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (5)
December 6, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 26
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
May 17, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (98)
Type:
Primary Sponsor