+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (2)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Veterans and Public Safety
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (3)
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 8
June 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor