+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's action
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On December 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On December 9, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration: Amended
- Committee report: Substituted
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Received in House
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Amended
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: State Government Oversight & Reform
- Introduced
+ − Votes (4)
December 10, 2014: Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote)
- Yeas: 32
December 9, 2014: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
December 9, 2014: Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
June 4, 2014: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor