+ − Effective Date
- September 20, 2024
+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed By The Governor
On June 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- The question being, Shall the amendments be concurred in?
- Concurred in House amendments
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On April 22, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Health Provider Services
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Health Provider Services
On November 16, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Health
- Passed
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Health
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Fiscal Notes (5)
+ − Votes (13)
May 22, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 31
May 8, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
April 22, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
December 6, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 19
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
June 27, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 17
December 8, 2016: Passed
- Yeas: 2
December 8, 2016: Passed
- Yeas: 1
December 7, 2016: Favorable Passage
May 4, 2016: Passed
- Yeas: 1
April 20, 2016: Favorable Passage
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor