+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective 3/23/18Certain provisions effective 12/22/17
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to
On November 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to
On September 20, 2017 in the House:
- Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur in House amendments
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed - Amended
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported - Amended
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor