+ − Effective Date
- June 30, 2021
+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective 6-30-2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed By The Governor
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Health
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to committee Health
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported Health
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Health
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor