+ − Full Texts (19)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute Criminal Justice
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Criminal Justice
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor