+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (2)
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Health
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (4)
October 18, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
June 21, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 20, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 11
June 13, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor