+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (6)
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Health
On October 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On October 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Judiciary
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Judiciary
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor