+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective 12/27/17
On September 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor