+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On September 12, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Amended
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor