+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (2)
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 9, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
March 8, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor