+ − Full Texts (14)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 5, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Re-referred to Finance Rules and Reference
On November 30, 2023 in the House:
- Re-referred Rules and Reference
On June 27, 2023 in the House:
- Reported State and Local Government
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee State and Local Government
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported Government Oversight
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (9)
December 5, 2023: Re-referred
- Yeas: 12
June 27, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 9
June 13, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
May 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
April 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
March 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
March 8, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor