+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Economic and Workforce Development
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported Small Business and Economic Opportunity
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Small Business and Economic Opportunity
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
March 28, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor