+ − Full Texts (22)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Passed - Amended
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Economic and Workforce Development
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Economic and Workforce Development
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Finance
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Finance
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor