+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (2)
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Small Business and Economic Opportunity
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (8)
April 24, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 92
February 28, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 88
October 30, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
October 18, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
May 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 14
May 10, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 66
+ − Sponsors (105)
Type:
Primary Sponsor