+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed - Amended
On September 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- To committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor