+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Effective date note: Sections 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 effective 01/07/13
On September 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor's action
On September 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On September 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On September 12, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On September 10, 2012 in the House:
- Committee report: Substituted
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Health & Aging
- Received in House
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
- Committee report: Substituted
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
- Introduced
+ − Votes (3)
September 12, 2012: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 94
September 12, 2012: House Amendments
- Yeas: 32
May 16, 2012: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 33