+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date: August 15, 2013
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's action
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: State and Local Government
- Received in House
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
- Committee report
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: State Government Oversight & Reform
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2013: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 96
April 10, 2013: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (76)
Type:
Primary Sponsor