+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor