+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective 4/6/17Effective: April 6, 2017; Certain other provisions effective other dates
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On November 10, 2016 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor