+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date: September 17, 2014
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's action
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
- Committee report
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Health and Aging
- Received in House
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Medicaid, Health & Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2014: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 96
May 28, 2014: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor