+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 12, 2024 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Health Provider Services
On June 26, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Health Provider Services
On June 22, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed
On June 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Health
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Health
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Votes (10)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
June 12, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 8
November 29, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
June 30, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 96
June 21, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 29
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
March 8, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (104)
Type:
Primary Sponsor