+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's action
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On December 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On December 10, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Substituted
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Health and Aging
- Received in House
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Substituted
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Medicaid, Health & Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Votes (5)
December 11, 2014: Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
December 11, 2014: Third Consideration - Emergency Clause
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
December 10, 2014: Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote)
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 6
December 10, 2014: Passed as emergency measure
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
June 3, 2014: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor