+ − Full Texts (17)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Passed
On December 14, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Health
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Health
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Amended Finance
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Finance
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor