+ − Full Texts (19)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective 2/5/20
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On October 10, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Aging and Long-Term Care
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Aging and Long-Term Care
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported - Amended Health, Human Services and Medicaid
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Health, Human Services and Medicaid
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (81)
Type:
Primary Sponsor