+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective 3/30/18Emergency: effective March 30, 2018
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported
On November 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On October 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (76)
Type:
Primary Sponsor