+ − Effective Date
- September 13, 2022
+ − Full Texts (20)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective 9-13-2022
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed By The Governor
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute Ways and Means
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to committee Ways and Means
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute Finance
On September 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Finance
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor