+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent To The Governor
On June 26, 2024 in the House:
- Passed
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
On June 11, 2024 in the House:
- Referred to committee Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed
On May 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Veterans and Public Safety
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Veterans and Public Safety
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Votes (6)
June 26, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 97
June 25, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 9
May 22, 2024: Passed
- Yeas: 31
May 14, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (106)
Type:
Primary Sponsor