+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective 3/30/18Emergency; effective 3/30/18
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendments
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Amended
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor