+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date: June 2, 2014
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's action
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurrence
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd consideration
- Committee report: Substituted
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd consideration
- Committee report: Substituted
On November 20, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Policy and Legislative Oversight
- Received in House
On October 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: State Government Oversight & Reform
- Introduced
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2014: Bill Passed (Vote)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 37
February 26, 2014: Motion laid on table (Vote)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 38
February 26, 2014: Motion laid on table (Vote)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 38
February 26, 2014: Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 9
November 20, 2013: Motion to Table Amendment
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 10
November 20, 2013: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor